CT HB05507 | 2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-23 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To: (1) Clarify that operation of a truck on a highway where truck passage is prohibited constitutes an infraction, and establish a defense for such operation if the operator has a permit for such use or presents evidence of a destination or origin related to such highway, and (2) provide for the Commissioner of Motor Vehicles to design and issue enhanced recognition number plates to replace existing number plates, other than special number plates, to enhance the ability of children and other individuals to assist in a law enforcement investigation of an abduction or other crime by better enabling the child or other individual to recall and describe the number plate of a suspect motor vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Issuance Of Enhanced Recognition Number Plates.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-23 Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2012-04-19 File Number 546
2012-04-19 House Calendar Number 401
2012-04-19 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2012-04-19 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-04-13 Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/12 5:00 PM
2012-04-02 Joint Favorable Substitute
2012-04-02 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-03-15 Public Hearing 03/19
2012-03-12 Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback