CT HB05500 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - File Number 543
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - File Number 543
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To revise provisions concerning (1) juror compensation, (2) risk protection orders or warrants, (3) a supervised diversionary program for persons with intellectual disabilities or autism spectrum disorder, (4) the use of ignition interlock devices, (5) the jurisdiction for offenses committed by means of transmitted communications, (6) compensation for persons who are incarcerated, (7) bail payments, (8) competency to stand trial, and (9) credit for time served under house arrest.
Title
An Act Concerning Revisions To Various Laws Concerning Juror Compensation, Ignition Interlock Devices, The Department Of Correction, Judicial Retirement Salaries And Criminal Law And Criminal Procedure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | File Number 543 |
2024-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 369 |
2024-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-14 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |