CT HB05500 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-7-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-7-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require institutions of higher education to provide financial aid information in a uniform way to ensure that students understand their true higher education costs.
Title
An Act Requiring Institutions Of Higher Education To Provide Students With Uniform Financial Aid Information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 413 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 87 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 87 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-04 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-04 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-03 | House | Public Act 13-95 |
2013-05-30 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-30 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-30 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-06 | House | File Number 751 |
2013-05-06 | House | Senate Calendar Number 516 |
2013-05-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-02 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6304 |
2013-04-23 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-23 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-26 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-03-05 | House | File Number 24 |
2013-03-05 | House | House Calendar Number 51 |
2013-03-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-03-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/04/13 5:00 PM |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-02-19 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2013-01-29 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-01-24 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |