CT HB05500 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow a municipality to include incremental state sales taxes and personal income taxes as part of the financing plan for a redevelopment project, and to adjust certain dates related to the financing for the Steel Point project in Bridgeport.
Title
An Act Concerning An Adjustment To Certain Dates Relating To The Financing Of Steel Point In Bridgeport.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 430 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 181 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 181 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-06-01 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-29 | Public Act 12-144 | |
2012-05-09 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Passed | |
2012-05-03 | Senate Calendar Number 479 | |
2012-05-03 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-05-02 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |
2012-05-02 | House Passed | |
2012-04-18 | File Number 509 | |
2012-04-18 | House Calendar Number 385 | |
2012-04-18 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-18 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-12 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-04-04 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-03 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-12 | Public Hearing 03/16 | |
2012-03-09 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |