CT HB05497 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - File Number 262
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To prevent employers in the securities industry from requiring employees to enter into noncompete agreements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Prohibiting Certain Employers In The Securities Industry From Requiring Employees To Enter Into Noncompete Agreements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05HouseFile Number 262
2018-04-05HouseHouse Calendar Number 195
2018-04-05HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-04-05HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM
2018-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-20HouseJoint Favorable
2018-03-13HousePublic Hearing 03/15
2018-03-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Banking

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback