CT HB05494 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-18 - Public Hearing 02/22
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-18 - Public Hearing 02/22
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To permit local police departments to charge for motor vehicle accident or investigative reports, parallel to the Commissioner of Public Safety's authority to charge for such reports.
Title
An Act Permitting Local Police To Charge For Motor Vehicle Accident Or Investigative Reports.
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Dillon [D] | Rep. Roland Lemar [D] | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Rep. Robert Megna [D] |
House Public Safety and Security Committee | Rep. Toni Walker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | Public Hearing 02/22 | |
2011-02-03 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | |
2011-02-01 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-02-01 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |