CT HB05489 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - File Number 535
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - File Number 535
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Legislative Program Review and Investigations committee concerning alignment of post-secondary education and employment.
Title
An Act Concerning Secondary School Reform.
Sponsors
House Education Committee | Sen. Thomas Gaffey [D] | Rep. Christopher Lyddy [D] | Rep. Mary Mushinsky [D] |
Rep. Tom Reynolds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | File Number 535 | |
2010-04-14 | House Calendar Number 318 | |
2010-04-14 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-14 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-08 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-04-01 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-01 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-03-24 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-22 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-19 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | |
2010-03-11 | Public Hearing 03/15 | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |