CT HB05487 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - File Number 604
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - File Number 604
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the amount of the property tax credit and eliminate eligibility restrictions, increase the phase-out threshold for married individuals filing jointly, index certain amounts and income thresholds and allow such credit to be refundable.
Title
An Act Concerning The Property Tax Credit Against The Personal Income Tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 25 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 25 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | File Number 604 |
2022-04-25 | House | House Calendar Number 467 |
2022-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 12:00 PM |
2022-04-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-06 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-21 | House | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |