CT HB05477 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Senate Calendar Number 598
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Senate Calendar Number 598
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To change the date upon which the Office of Policy and Management must provide a certified list of renters to the Comptroller and to make technical changes in light of the Office of Policy and Management's switch from a paper to an electronic application format.
Title
An Act Concerning The Renter's Grant Application Period.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 258 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Calendar Number 598 |
2016-05-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-05-03 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2016-05-03 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2016-05-03 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-03 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6118 |
2016-03-24 | House | File Number 196 |
2016-03-24 | House | House Calendar Number 161 |
2016-03-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-29 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2016-02-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |