CT HB05476 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - File Number 572
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - File Number 572
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) establish partial fee reductions for properties with certain stormwater management systems, and (2) include heating, ventilating and air conditioning systems in the projects eligible for school building project grants.
Title
An Act Concerning The Provision Of Partial Fee Reductions By Municipal Stormwater Authorities And The Inclusion Of Heating, Ventilating And Air Conditioning Systems In School Building Project Grant Payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | File Number 572 |
2022-04-21 | House | House Calendar Number 415 |
2022-04-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/22 5:00 PM |
2022-04-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-16 | House | Public Hearing 03/21 |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |