CT HB05475 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To make minor and technical changes to the tax and related statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Legislative Commissioners' Recommendations For Minor And Technical Revisions To The Tax And Related Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 379 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 126 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 126 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-13 | House | Public Act 22-110 |
2022-05-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Passed |
2022-04-30 | House | Senate Calendar Number 526 |
2022-04-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-28 | House | House Passed |
2022-04-25 | House | File Number 595 |
2022-04-25 | House | House Calendar Number 465 |
2022-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 12:00 PM |
2022-04-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-06 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-16 | House | Public Hearing 03/21 |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |