CT HB05473 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-10 - File Number 417
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-10 - File Number 417
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require that the majority leaders' roundtable group on affordable housing conduct a study concerning the elimination of any municipal design review processes in connection with residential development.
Title
An Act Concerning The Expansion Of Municipal Sewerage Systems To Promote The Development Of Housing And Requiring The Majority Leaders' Roundtable Group On Affordable Housing To Study The Elimination Of Municipal Design Review Processes.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Rep. Jason Rojas [D] | Sen. MD Rahman [D] | Rep. Aundre Bumgardner [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-22 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | File Number 417 |
2024-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 273 |
2024-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |