CT HB05471 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure that any victim's request for restitution is considered by the court.
Title
An Act Concerning Victim's Rights And Restitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 313 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 278 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 278 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Public Act 18-128 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 559 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2018-05-09 | House | House Passed |
2018-04-19 | House | File Number 586 |
2018-04-19 | House | House Calendar Number 387 |
2018-04-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-04 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-09 | House | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |