CT HB05461 | 2015 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-24 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To impose a tax of one cent per ounce on any carbonated nonalcoholic beverage which is intended for human consumption and contains any added caloric sweetener and to apply the proceeds from such tax to provide public education and outreach regarding obesity, heart disease and diabetes and to fund the Governor's Scholarship program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Imposing A Tax On Sugary Soft Drinks.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-24HouseReferred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2015-03-19HouseFile Number 104
2015-03-19HouseHouse Calendar Number 80
2015-03-19HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2015-03-19HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2015-03-13HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/15 5:00 PM
2015-03-06HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2015-03-05HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2015-03-04HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Children
2015-03-03HouseDrafted by Committee
2015-02-19HouseVote to Draft
2015-02-11HousePublic Hearing 02/17
2015-01-16HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Children

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback