CT HB05460 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-12 - File Number 421
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-12 - File Number 421
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Treasurer to post notice of all property presumed abandoned, regardless of the amount of such property.
Title
An Act Concerning Notification Of Unclaimed Property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | File Number 421 |
2022-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 300 |
2022-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-14 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2022-03-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |