CT HB05460 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - File Number 395
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - File Number 395
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Department of Economic and Community Development to develop a plan to facilitate the growth of a bioscience and pharmaceutical presence in southeastern Connecticut.
Title
An Act Establishing A Plan For Emerging Bioscience And Pharmaceutical Businesses In Southeastern Connecticut.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | File Number 395 |
2013-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 263 |
2013-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |
2013-03-06 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |