CT HB05459 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - File Number 449
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - File Number 449
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) provide that, subject to certain restrictions on electioneering, members of the public may utilize restrooms in the building where a polling place is located, and (2) make technical and conforming changes to statutes concerning elections and referenda.
Title
An Act Concerning Elections And Referenda.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | File Number 449 |
2018-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 320 |
2018-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-06 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-09 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |