CT HB05421 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-16 - File Number 515
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-16 - File Number 515
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To criminalize unauthorized dissemination of intimate images that are digitally altered or created through the use of artificial intelligence.
Title
An Act Concerning Unlawful Dissemination Of Intimate Images That Are Digitally Altered Or Created Through The Use Of Artificial Intelligence.
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Rep. Craig Fishbein [R] | Rep. Holly Cheeseman [R] | Rep. Christie Carpino [R] |
Rep. Devin Carney [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | File Number 515 |
2024-04-16 | House | House Calendar Number 353 |
2024-04-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2024-03-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |