CT HB05420 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require (1) any municipality containing an institution of higher education to establish a separate voting district containing such institution if such institution reports certain data to the United States Department of Education for the year prior to the election, and (2) the registrars of voters or the legislative body of such municipality, as the case may be, to provide a suitable polling place at or near such institution for which a separate voting district is established.
Title
An Act Requiring Additional Polling Places At Institutions Of Higher Education During State Elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-25 | House | No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2018-04-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-25 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2018-04-12 | House | File Number 440 |
2018-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 311 |
2018-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-06 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-09 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2018-03-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |