CT HB05408 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - File Number 450
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - File Number 450
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require executive branch state agencies to purchase a certain percentage of procured print or digital advertising from in-state commercial or nonprofit news publishers.
Title
An Act Concerning The Purchase Of Print And Digital Advertising By The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-22 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | File Number 450 |
2024-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 294 |
2024-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2024-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |