CT HB05400 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure that local and regional boards of education have information concerning whether an applicant has been found to have committed abuse or sexual misconduct and that local and regional boards of education share such findings with other boards of education who may employ such applicant.
Title
An Act Concerning The Disclosure Of Certain Education Personnel Records, Criminal Penalties For Threatening In Educational Settings And The Exclusion Of A Minor's Name From Summary Process Complaints.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 328 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 332 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 211 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 332 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 211 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-18 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-18 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-13 | House | Public Act 16-67 |
2016-05-03 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-03 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-03 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-30 | House | Senate Calendar Number 583 |
2016-04-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-30 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2016-04-30 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-30 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5737 |
2016-04-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-25 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-20 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Education |
2016-04-14 | House | File Number 605 |
2016-04-14 | House | House Calendar Number 373 |
2016-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-28 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |