CT HB05399 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-18 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-18 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To expand the programs and services offered through the Project Longevity Initiative.
Title
An Act Concerning Project Longevity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-18 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-13 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-05 | House | File Number 301 |
2022-04-05 | House | House Calendar Number 231 |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-30 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-11 | House | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |