CT HB05399 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - File Number 251
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - File Number 251
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) limit the assignment of unpaid property tax, water and sewer liens, and (2) ensure that persons responsible for the payment of such liens are notified of any such assignment.
Title
An Act Concerning The Assignment Of Certain Property Tax, Water And Sewer Liens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | File Number 251 |
2018-04-05 | House | House Calendar Number 184 |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |