CT HB05397 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - File Number 239
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - File Number 239
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow a police officer, with approval of a medical control official, to take a person who appears to be incapacitated by drugs or due to a medical emergency into protective custody and have such person brought to a treatment facility or hospital.
Title
An Act Concerning Emergency Intervention By A Police Officer When A Person Is Incapacitated By Drugs Or Due To A Medical Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | File Number 239 |
2024-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 180 |
2024-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |