CT HB05397 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-02 - File Number 612
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-02 - File Number 612
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To permit state agencies to use purchasing cards for purchases that exceed ten thousand dollars.
Title
An Act Concerning The Maximum Amount For Purchases Using The P-card.
Sponsors
Rep. David Aldarondo [D] | House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Rep. Mary Mushinsky [D] | Rep. Sandra Nafis [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 141 AS AMENDED (Y: 123 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | File Number 612 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Calendar Number 447 | |
2012-05-02 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-30 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-04-30 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3648 | |
2012-04-05 | File Number 295 | |
2012-04-05 | House Calendar Number 228 | |
2012-04-05 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-05 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-30 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-22 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-21 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-03-05 | Public Hearing 03/09 | |
2012-03-02 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |