CT HB05385 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Labor Commissioner to conduct a study regarding the establishment of a full employment trust fund in order to provide funding to existing employment opportunities and job-training programs or to create new employment opportunities and job-training programs.
Title
An Act Studying The Establishment Of A Full Employment Trust Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-20 | House | File Number 66 |
2024-03-20 | House | House Calendar Number 78 |
2024-03-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |