CT HB05367 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-30 - Senate Calendar Number 580
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-30 - Senate Calendar Number 580
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To calculate an individual's unemployment benefit rate using four quarters of earnings, to put a three-year freeze on the maximum unemployment benefit rate and to require certain recipients of unemployment benefits to post their resume online in order to continue to receive such benefits.
Title
An Act Concerning The Total Unemployment Benefit Rate And An Online Employment Exchange.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 203 (Y: 131 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-30 | House | Senate Calendar Number 580 |
2016-04-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-30 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2016-04-30 | House | House Passed |
2016-03-29 | House | File Number 230 |
2016-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 173 |
2016-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2016-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |