CT HB05349 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection to conduct a pollen count and report such information for public health purposes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Performance Of A Pollen Count.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Rep. Hector Arzeno [D] | Rep. Patricia Dillon [D] | Rep. Julio Concepcion [D] |
Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Rep. Bobby Gibson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-04-04 | House | File Number 276 |
2024-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 193 |
2024-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |