CT HB05349 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-5-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-5-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require the timely reporting by the police of a death to the next of kin.
Title
An Act Concerning The Timely Reporting By The Police Of A Death.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 330 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 114 AS AMENDED (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 114 AS AMENDED (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-10 | House | Public Act 22-61 |
2022-05-03 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2022-05-03 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-03 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-29 | House | File Number 682 |
2022-04-29 | House | Senate Calendar Number 523 |
2022-04-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-27 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-27 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5580 |
2022-04-25 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-25 | House | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-25 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-20 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2022-04-14 | House | File Number 492 |
2022-04-14 | House | House Calendar Number 346 |
2022-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |