CT HB05346 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - File Number 204
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - File Number 204
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a pilot program to provide funding for social worker services in emergency shelters.
Title
An Act Establishing A Pilot Program To Fund Social Workers In Emergency Shelters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | File Number 204 |
2022-03-30 | House | House Calendar Number 186 |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |