CT HB05341 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Social Services to pay providers of in-patient mental health services in eastern Connecticut the same rates as such providers in other areas of the state.
Title
An Act Concerning Medicaid Payment Rates For Providers Of In-patient Mental Health Services In Eastern Connecticut.
Sponsors
House Human Services Committee | Rep. Michael Winkler [D] | Rep. Tammy Nuccio [R] | Rep. Christine Conley [D] |
Rep. Brian Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-28 | House | File Number 135 |
2022-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 144 |
2022-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-17 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |