CT HB05340 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - File Number 234
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - File Number 234
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow a victim of sexual harassment, sexual assault, stalking or intimate partner violence who is not a student or employee of an institution of higher education to be informed and participate in an investigation or disciplinary hearing of the responding student or employee.
Title
An Act Allowing Third-party Victims To Participate In An Investigation Or Disciplinary Proceeding By An Institution Of Higher Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | File Number 234 |
2024-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 175 |
2024-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2024-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |