CT HB05337 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide that owners of real property taken for use for school construction purposes shall be compensated the greater of the average value of two independent appraisals or the assessed value of such property according to the most recent grand list.
Title
An Act Concerning The Acquisition Of Real Property To Be Used For School Construction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-03-24 | House | File Number 183 |
2016-03-24 | House | House Calendar Number 148 |
2016-03-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |