CT HB05337 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide patients with written notice regarding fees charged for services provided at hospital-based facilities.
Title
An Act Concerning Fees Charged For Services Provided At Hospital-based Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 415 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 88 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 88 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-22 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-21 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-20 | House | Public Act 14-145 |
2014-05-07 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate Passed |
2014-04-25 | House | Senate Calendar Number 474 |
2014-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-23 | House | House Passed |
2014-04-15 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-15 | House | No New File by Committee on Public Health |
2014-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-08 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health |
2014-04-02 | House | File Number 297 |
2014-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 177 |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-13 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-28 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2014-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |