CT HB05334 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - File Number 182
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - File Number 182
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To make changes to certain statutes concerning supportive housing.
Title
An Act Making A Technical Correction To A Statute Concerning Supportive Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | File Number 182 |
2016-03-24 | House | House Calendar Number 147 |
2016-03-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |