CT HB05334 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Senate Calendar Number 524
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Senate Calendar Number 524
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To clarify procedures concerning the sale, abandonment or alienation of a water supply source or potential water supply source and land associated with the water supply source.
Title
An Act Concerning The Sale Or Abandonment Of Water Supply Sources And Associated Land.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 281 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Senate Calendar Number 524 | |
2012-05-09 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-05-08 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |
2012-05-08 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-08 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5411 | |
2012-04-10 | File Number 310 | |
2012-04-10 | House Calendar Number 251 | |
2012-04-10 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-10 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-02 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 10:00 AM | |
2012-03-23 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-23 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-03-09 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | |
2012-02-29 | Public Hearing 03/07 | |
2012-02-28 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |