CT HB05329 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To: (1) Impose additional limitations on the manner in which cannabis may be gifted, sold or transferred; (2) impose additional penalties for prohibited gifts, sales and transfers of cannabis; (3) specify that a producer (A) shall be liable for the remainder of the full conversion fee if the producer fails to create two equity joint ventures that receive a final license within a specified time frame, and (B) that receives license expansion authorization shall not create more than two equity joint ventures; (4) specify that a dispensary facility (A) shall be liable for the remainder of the full conversion fee if the dispensary facility fails to create two equity joint ventures that each receive a final license within a specified time frame, and (B) that converts its license to a hybrid-retailer license shall not create more than two equity joint ventures; (5) provide that the Social Equity Council shall not approve any equity joint venture that shares the same social equity applicant with another equity joint venture; (6) ban cannabis billboard advertisements; (7) modify certain provisions concerning advertisements by cannabis establishments and related businesses; and (8) eliminate a provision that prohibits a municipality from granting zoning approval for more retailers or micro-cultivators than a number that would allow for one retailer and one micro-cultivator for every twenty-five thousand residents of the municipality.
Title
An Act Concerning Cannabis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 346 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 94 AS AMENDED (Y: 98 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 94 AS AMENDED (Y: 98 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act 22-103 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-27 | Senate | File Number 672 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 495 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2022-04-26 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-26 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5358 |
2022-03-30 | House | File Number 202 |
2022-03-30 | House | House Calendar Number 183 |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |