CT HB05321 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-19 - Motion Failed JF
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-19 - Motion Failed JF
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a pilot program to permit same day registration for municipal primaries in 2011.
Title
An Act Concerning A Pilot Program For Municipal Primary Day Registration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-19 | Motion Failed JF | |
2010-04-13 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-04-06 | File Number 321 | |
2010-04-06 | House Calendar Number 176 | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-06 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 10:00 AM | |
2010-03-18 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-17 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-02-25 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |