CT HB05320 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize conservation officers to enforce certain prohibitions concerning invasive plants.
Title
An Act Concerning The Enforcement Of Prohibited Actions Concerning Certain Invasive Plants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 147 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-05 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-04-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-04-29 | Public Act 10-20 | |
2010-04-21 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Calendar Number 375 | |
2010-04-14 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-13 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate | |
2010-04-13 | House Passed | |
2010-03-30 | File Number 219 | |
2010-03-30 | House Calendar Number 133 | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-23 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-15 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-03-02 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |