CT HB05318 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - File Number 651
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - File Number 651
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To develop a plan for a school resource officer training course.
Title
An Act Concerning School Resource Officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | File Number 651 | |
2010-04-27 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-27 | New File by Committee on Public Safety | |
2010-04-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-21 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-04-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-20 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-04-13 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Safety | |
2010-04-07 | File Number 365 | |
2010-04-07 | House Calendar Number 198 | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-07 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-31 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-22 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-19 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-02-25 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |