CT HB05317 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make commercial feed requirements and attendant authorities of the Department of Agriculture consistent with federal standards and requirements.
Title
An Act Concerning Commercial Feed And The Term And Fee For Certain Licenses Issued By The Department Of Agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 386 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 390 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 104 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 390 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 104 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-20 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-20 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-16 | House | Public Act 16-102 |
2016-05-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Passed |
2016-04-25 | House | Senate Calendar Number 487 |
2016-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-22 | House | House Passed |
2016-03-31 | House | File Number 340 |
2016-03-31 | House | House Calendar Number 234 |
2016-03-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |