CT HB05312 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit persons who offer consumer goods and services to the public from refusing to accept cash as a form of payment.
Title
An Act Concerning Acceptable Forms Of Currency As Payment In Local Businesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 343 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 166 AS AMENDED (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 166 AS AMENDED (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-10 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-10 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-09 | House | Public Act 21-60 |
2021-06-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2021-06-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-26 | House | File Number 722 |
2021-05-26 | House | Senate Calendar Number 493 |
2021-05-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-24 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-24 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8921 |
2021-02-25 | House | File Number 5 |
2021-02-25 | House | House Calendar Number 41 |
2021-02-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-02-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/24/21 5:00 PM |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-02-02 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-01-25 | House | Public Hearing 01/28 |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |