CT HB05308 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-31 - File Number 857
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-31 - File Number 857
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide refuse removal and disposal company customers fair notice and the option to cancel contract renewals.
Title
An Act Concerning Refuse Removal Or Disposal Commercial Contract Renewals.
Sponsors
Rep. David Baram [D] | Rep. Fred Camillo [R] | Rep. Anthony D'Amelio [R] | House General Law Committee |
Rep. David Scribner [R] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 191 AS AMENDED (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-31 | File Number 857 | |
2011-05-31 | Senate Calendar Number 579 | |
2011-05-31 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-26 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-05-26 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6181 | |
2011-04-27 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-27 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-27 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-26 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-21 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-03-23 | File Number 174 | |
2011-03-23 | House Calendar Number 111 | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-03-23 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-10 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-02 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law | |
2011-03-01 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-02-16 | Public Hearing 02/22 | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |