CT HB05298 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - File Number 479
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - File Number 479
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To clarify the meanings of "sexual intercourse" and "sexual contact" following the Connecticut Supreme Court rulings in State v. Douglas C. and State v. Joseph V.
Title
An Act Clarifying The Meanings Of Sexual Intercourse And Sexual Contact.
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Rep. Travis Simms [D] | Rep. Kate Farrar [D] | Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R] |
Rep. Eleni Kavros DeGraw [D] | Rep. Jillian Gilchrest [D] | Rep. Aimee Berger-Girvalo [D] | Rep. Liz Linehan [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | File Number 479 |
2024-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 334 |
2024-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/24 12:00 PM |
2024-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2024-02-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |