CT HB05294 | 2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To establish an auto glass temporary license to allow auto glass companies doing business in the state to perform auto glass work in the event of a state disaster or emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Auto Glass Emergency Temporary Technicians.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2020-03-10HouseJoint Favorable
2020-02-27HousePublic Hearing 03/03
2020-02-26HouseReferred to Joint Committee on General Law

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback