CT HB05293 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require the same direct, face-to-face sale of electronic nicotine delivery systems and vapor products as is required for the sale of cigarettes and smokeless tobacco products.
Title
An Act Concerning The Sale Of Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems And Vapor Products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 372 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 167 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 167 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Public Act 18-109 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-03 | Senate | File Number 671 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 497 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2018-05-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-02 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3805 |
2018-04-26 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-26 | House | No New File by Committee on General Law |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-24 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred by House to Committee on General Law |
2018-04-10 | House | File Number 359 |
2018-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 233 |
2018-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-03 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-26 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-16 | House | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |