CT HB05288 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To create a task force to examine the motor vehicle accident report form used by law enforcement officers and consider modifications to such form.
Title
An Act Creating A Task Force To Examine The Motor Vehicle Accident Report Form Used By Law Enforcement Officers.
Sponsors
House Public Safety and Security Committee | Rep. Maria Horn [D] | Rep. Timothy Ackert [R] | Rep. Carol Hall [R] |
Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Rep. Craig Fishbein [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 301 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 90 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 90 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Special Act 22-7 |
2022-05-02 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 494 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2022-04-26 | House | House Passed |
2022-04-05 | House | File Number 295 |
2022-04-05 | House | House Calendar Number 225 |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-30 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-11 | House | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |