CT HB05288 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - File Number 250
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - File Number 250
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To study the feasibility, costs and benefits of establishing a nursery facility at the Connecticut Correctional Institution, Niantic, for the purpose of caring for children born to women during their detention at such institution.
Title
An Act Concerning Children Of Incarcerated Women.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | File Number 250 | |
2012-04-04 | House Calendar Number 203 | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-04 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-22 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-21 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-03-12 | Public Hearing 03/16 | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |