CT HB05284 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - File Number 108
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - File Number 108
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide adequate state reimbursement to cover the costs of providing meals to elderly persons.
Title
An Act Increasing Funding For Elderly Nutrition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | File Number 108 |
2016-03-22 | House | House Calendar Number 102 |
2016-03-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-09 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |