CT HB05281 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - File Number 71
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - File Number 71
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To include a physician experienced in the fields of respiratory or pulmonary medicine on the disability retirement board.
Title
An Act Concerning Members Of The Disability Retirement Board.
Sponsors
House Labor and Public Employees Committee | Rep. Edwin Vargas [D] | Rep. Ezequiel Santiago [D] | Rep. Timothy Bowles [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | House | File Number 71 |
2014-03-24 | House | House Calendar Number 53 |
2014-03-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-03-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-17 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |